Trustees GREEN ECONOMICS INSTITUTE TRUST
Charity number: 1117638

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRIAM KENNET | Chair | 31 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Ana Diaz Vidal | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aaron Sternisky | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hans Kare Flo | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Alazar | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Raymonde Harrington | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Hawkins | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RASA Tumaseviciute | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chelangat Scholar | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leena Ahmed | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sukriti Anand | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy NALUBEGA | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anjikwi Mshelbwala | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr EHTESHAM ABBASI PHD | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Madison-Vuleta | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marlyn Hughes | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.