SHALOM CHRISTIAN RETREAT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer a place of quiet retreat for people in need regardless of race, religion or creed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 30 November 2006: Standard registration
- 01 November 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £8.44k | £8.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £8.49k | £6.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 15 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN PEMBROKESHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN RETREAT CENTRE AND PLACE OF SPIRITUAL REFRESHMENT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PEMBROKESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.