ALSO (UK)

Charity number: 1117368
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 761 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 761 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1126 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1126 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 October 2017 On time Download