ALSO (UK)

Charity number: 1117368
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £329.97k £273.73k £261.30k £200.20k £129.38k
Total expenditure £356.70k £303.99k £303.52k £272.71k £201.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0