VULVAL HEALTH AWARENESS CAMPAIGN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making awareness of vulval conditions via the VHAC website, medical conferences, the VHAC leaflet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2007: Standard registration
- 01 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- VHAC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £2.22k | £8.05k | £7.88k | £397 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £1.30k | £5.10k | £6.19k | £3.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 25 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM VULVAL DISEASES (B) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO CAUSES OF VULVAL DISEASES ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED. (C) THE PRACTICE OT THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DIAGNOSING AND TREATING VULVAL DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window