Accounts and annual returns PARA DANCE UK

Charity number: 1116988
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 July 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 July 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window