Financial history EMPOWERING PEOPLE INSPIRING COMMUNITIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1118644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.99m £4.22m £4.53m £4.67m £5.53m
Total expenditure £2.55m £2.87m £3.13m £3.42m £4.99m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.25m N/A N/A £587.65k £21.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £4.66m £5.42m
Income - Charitable activities £3.97m £4.16m £4.52m £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £47 £0
Income - Other £19.36k £53.84k £8.75k £17.70k £103.89k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.55m £2.87m £3.13m £3.42m £4.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0