Trustees EMPOWERING PEOPLE INSPIRING COMMUNITIES LIMITED
Charity number: 1118644

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Funnell | Chair | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amandeep Jhawar | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Francis Small | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NEWMARCH | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Heather Challinor | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Emery | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas William Michael Leggett | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Lunio | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.