BRENT REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS FORUM

Charity number: 1117090
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 April 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1909 days
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1909 days
Annual return 13 April 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2274 days
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2274 days
Annual return 13 April 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2639 days
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2639 days
Annual return 14 April 2012 28 September 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2011 28 September 2012 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3368 days