DATTA SAHAJ YOGA MISSION (UK) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable mankind to achieve both personal as well as universal peace and happiness through the promotion of meditation and yoga techniques, to advance the principles of Sahaj Yoga for the public benefit through the spread and reciting of the divine Mantra ''Hari Om Tat Sat Jai Guru Datta'' and to advance all religions and hindusim in accordance with the doctorine of Sahaj Yoga.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2007: Standard registration
- DSYM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHIRENDRA SHANABHAI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PRAKASH KANJIBHAI PATALIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHANDRAKANT HIRALAL SHUKLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.68k | £22.93k | £112.47k | £37.64k | £9.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.53k | £17.17k | £17.47k | £127.40k | £948 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED ON 20 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE PRINCIPLES OF SAHAJ YOGA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF HINDUISM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF SAHAJ YOGA; (3) TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (4) TO PROMOTE GOOD PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF SAHAJ YOGA (SPONTANEOUS MEDITATION); AND (5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND SELECT, BEING PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Chestnut Grove
South Croydon
CR2 7LH
- Phone:
- 02086502211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
www\\dsym.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window