INTEGRATION, TRAINING AND ENTERPRISE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1118586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 September 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 04 April 2020 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 25 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 May 2018 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required