Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT PREPARATORY SCHOOL GRAVESEND

Charity number: 1119139
Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 August 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 October 2019 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 July 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window