THE RUFFORD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £4.56m £4.89m £4.29m £4.70m £3.67m
Total expenditure £4.68m £4.62m £4.47m £3.99m £3.89m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.15m £1.11m £437.50k £813.20k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £59.62k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.41m £3.78m £3.80m £3.89m £3.67m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.39m £4.26m £4.12m £3.67m £3.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £281.40k £362.91k £351.83k £321.21k £311.25k
Expenditure - Governance £64.05k £60.13k £67.57k £59.85k £57.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £3.62m £3.51m £3.04m £2.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £281.40k £362.91k £351.83k £321.21k £311.25k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0