THOMAS WILLIAM VARLEY ROE DECEASED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants to Whitby Literary and Philosophical Society in accordance with the will of Mr Thomas Roe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOLLY WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN BERNARD MORRISEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.69k | £5.99k | £11.62k | £3.32k | £12.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.04k | £60.10k | £24.89k | £53.95k | £45.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF THOMAS WILLIAM VARLEY ROE DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
8.2.I PRESERVATION OF THE COLLECTION OF WORKS OF ART AND OTHER EXHIBITS 8.2.II ACQUISITION OF WORKS OF ART AND OTHER EXHIBITS 8.2.III PAYMENT OF A CURATOR APPOINTED OR APPROVED BY THE SOCIETY OF EXPERTS NEEDED FOR PRESERVATION OR OTHER WORK.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHISPERING REEDS
GORSTAGE LANE
GORSTAGE
NORTHWICH
CW8 2ST
- Phone:
- 01606851522
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window