Financial history BENNETT PAIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £34.35k £37.45k £45.44k £37.66k £31.50k
Total expenditure £22.53k £78.45k £70.63k £68.16k £70.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A