Financial history NEST AYLESBURY VALE LIMITED

Charity number: 1119763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £32.76k £29.29k £60.48k £39.98k £65.00k
Total expenditure £43.68k £43.29k £46.83k £44.94k £45.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k £10.00k £15.00k £20.00k