INTERNATIONAL CAT CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Cat Care Ltd is a charity dedicated to promoting the health and welfare of cats through improved feline knowledge, to help us all care better for our cats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income:
£2,598,274
Donations and legacies | £1.23m | |
Charitable activities | £798.03k | |
Other trading activities | £525.48k | |
Investments | £35.30k | |
Other | £10.16k |
Total expenditure:
£2,624,634
Raising funds | £193.31k | |
Charitable activities | £2.43m | |
Other | £0 |
-£210,016 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £193.31k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.43m |
People
28 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2006: Standard registration
- THE FELINE ADVISORY BUREAU (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Hill | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Monaghan | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Poole | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Brenten | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Travaglia | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Chong | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Natasha Yu Pheng Lee | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aarti Hogan | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hiestand | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Campbell | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89m | £2.04m | £1.83m | £2.28m | £2.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19m | £2.07m | £2.11m | £2.21m | £2.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £642.59k | £681.06k | £676.20k | £967.90k | £1.23m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £469.58k | £544.16k | £436.45k | £580.63k | £525.48k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £723.41k | £762.04k | £675.74k | £689.17k | £798.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £37.58k | £45.38k | £33.18k | £34.62k | £35.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £12.20k | £8.00k | £3.88k | £7.38k | £10.16k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £77.86k | £45.67k | £25.62k | £291.38k | £408.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.86m | £1.78m | £1.96m | £2.06m | £2.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £324.19k | £290.54k | £149.11k | £148.62k | £193.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £33.11k | £71.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £15.82k | £16.30k | £14.95k | £16.48k | £16.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £383.29k | £116.10k | £129.46k | £82.80k | £178.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.16m | £1.37m | £1.38m | £1.42m | £1.23m | |
|
Other assets | £1.00m | £1.35m | £968.99k | £1.31m | £1.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £739.33k | £865.59k | £701.09k | £868.79k | £1.07m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 09 October 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 SEP 2014 as amended on 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HEALTH, WELFARE, CARE AND TREATMENT OF CATS AND PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS BY: A COLLATING, INTERPRETING AND DISSEMINATING THE BEST EVIDENCE-BASED KNOWLEDGE ON THE UNDERSTANDING OF DOMESTIC AND PET CATS, AND THEIR PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL WELLBEING. B PROVIDING EVIDENCE-BASED INFORMATION, PROTOCOLS, PROCEDURES AND PRACTICAL TRAINING TO ENABLE SUSTAINABLE AND ETHICAL SOLUTIONS TO BE DEVELOPED TO MANAGE UNOWNED DOMESTIC CAT POPULATIONS WORLDWIDE, WHILE MAINTAINING CAT WELFARE AND HUMAN HEALTH AS THE HIGHEST PRIORITIES. C PROVIDING EVIDENCE-BASED INFORMATION AND EDUCATION RESOURCES TO ENABLE BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF AND IMPROVED VETERINARY HEALTHCARE FOR, DOMESTIC AND PET CATS WORLDWIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
International Cat Care
Place Farm
Court Street
Tisbury
Salisbury
SP3 6LW
- Phone:
- 01747684966
- Email:
- info@icatcare.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window