Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE REFUGEE FORUM

Charity number: 1121560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window