WAKEFIELD TRINITY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1119077
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £110.08k £105.22k £112.17k £225.53k £573.83k
Total expenditure £116.40k £127.03k £111.66k £219.83k £468.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £6.00k N/A £58.00k £86.31k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £193.18k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £368.63k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.02k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £429.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £39.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £39.04k