Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, RECULVER

Charity number: 1117389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 February 2021 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required