Accounts and annual returns BURKINA FASO COMMUNITY IN THE UK (BFCUK)

Charity number: 1118322
Charity reporting is overdue by 224 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 224 days
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 224 days
Annual return 27 August 2020 29 March 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 August 2019 26 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 August 2018 03 July 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 August 2017 31 July 2018 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2017 Not Required