Financial history BURKINA FASO COMMUNITY IN THE UK (BFCUK)

Charity number: 1118322
Charity reporting is overdue by 278 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/08/2016 27/08/2017 27/08/2018 27/08/2019 27/08/2020
Total gross income £307 £1.11k £917 £9.45k £4.50k
Total expenditure £231 £870 £757 £6.00k £3.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A