Hessett Church Preservation Society

Charity number: 1117397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 September 2018 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 14 August 2018 45 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 September 2018 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 October 2017 116 days late Download