Hessett Church Preservation Society

Charity number: 1117397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.25k £1.90k £648 £4.01k £951
Total expenditure £4.54k £891 £3.20k £126 £18.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A