OAKDALE SILVER BAND

Charity number: 1120419
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION, ADOPTED 24 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ART OF BRASS BAND MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN CAERPHILLY BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION AND TRAINING AND BY PUBLIC PERFORMANCES OF A RANGE OF WORKS
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 02 August 2007 : registered
  • 09 May 2011 : removed (REMOVED BY APPLICATION)
  • 19 June 2011 : re-registered
  • 01 December 2019 : removed (REMOVED BY APPLICATION)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities