RIANA DEVELOPMENT NETWORK (RDN)

Charity number: 1119733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £38.10k £64.66k £57.69k £73.52k £130.75k
Total expenditure £43.67k £61.04k £54.78k £70.71k £122.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £9.74k £3.75k £15.08k £55.43k