CROSS & COCKADE INTERNATIONAL, THE FIRST WORLD WAR AVIATION HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1117741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download