NORTH LONDON ASSEMBLY HALL OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1117465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £359.31k £358.03k £371.28k £370.67k £214.61k
Total expenditure £424.85k £367.49k £394.24k £368.02k £200.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A