NORTH LONDON ASSEMBLY HALL OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian religion as practised by Jehovah's Witnesses geberally by advancing public religious education and worship, and specifically by providing a place for public religious worship in North London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GREYGOOSE | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Evans | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ELLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.67k | £214.61k | £6.14k | £776 | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.02k | £200.28k | £26.10k | £10.56k | £8.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS PRACTISED BY THAT BODY OF CHRISTIANS KNOWN AS JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES; (2) ADVANCING PUBLIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; (3) PROMOTING PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP; (4) MAINTAINING, IMPROVING AND PROMOTING THE NORTH LONDON ASSEMBLY HALL AS A PLACE FOR PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
174 BOWES ROAD
LONDON
N11 2JG
- Phone:
- 02088888765
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window