MORRIS GIBBY TRUST

Charity number: 1117516
Charity reporting is overdue by 1032 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1032 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1032 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 June 2018 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required