MORRIS GIBBY TRUST

Charity number: 1117516
Charity reporting is overdue by 1039 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £290.90k £456 £105 £6.05k £0
Total expenditure £262.68k £13.86k £9.55k £20.35k £17.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0