SOMALI CULTURAL RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1120160
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £23.60k £23.31k £35.78k £23.36k £32.46k
Total expenditure £23.84k £22.36k £28.10k £22.02k £25.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A