Financial history THE FRIENDS OF DANBURY ST JOHNS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1117530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.23k £7.66k £11.74k £8.44k £6.33k
Total expenditure £8.36k £6.01k £10.55k £13.12k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A