ALDERMAN SAMUEL WILSON FUND

Charity number: 1117548
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £3.96k £3.41k £9.77k £1.94k £2.55k
Total expenditure £5.04k £2.30k £5.00k £2.50k £2.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A