THE NEW CROSS GATE TRUST

Charity number: 1118010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 October 2016 On time Download