Children's University Trust

Charity number: 1118315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £534.06k £318.55k £289.55k £350.44k £363.06k
Total expenditure £562.38k £385.00k £344.56k £373.06k £366.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £12.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £518.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £113 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £543.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A