Accounts and annual returns THE VALERIE BESTON ARTISTS' TRUST

Charity number: 1117568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 August 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required