Financial history THE VALERIE BESTON ARTISTS' TRUST

Charity number: 1117568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.27k £9.90k £7.74k £6.90k £5.97k
Total expenditure £6.97k £8.94k £8.63k £7.74k £11.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A