WHITCHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 10 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 14 March 2017 On time Download