WHITCHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £41.92k £46.93k £46.22k £53.16k £38.15k
Total expenditure £37.77k £47.71k £50.21k £49.48k £41.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.08k £13.81k