WHITCHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denyse Coles Chair 12 October 2011
ANDOVER MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY Received: On time
Dr MORWENNA COLLINS Trustee None on record
SANDRA SMITH Trustee None on record
Paul Driver Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record
JACKIE BROWNE Trustee 13 April 2011 None on record
Brian Bent Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record
Mary Lambie Johnston Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
BARRY CARTER Trustee 08 February 2014 None on record
John Mariner Trustee 27 April 2016 None on record