Trustees SOUTH HERTS AND EDGWARE MASORTI
Charity number: 1117623
Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BRIAN GROSSMAN | Chair | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Eleanor Cohen | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Joseph Davis | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Michelle Cohen | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Marc Lux | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Roger Davis | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Zetter | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nathan | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fidler | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.