ST EDMUNDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1118103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 September 2020 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 September 2020 87 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 August 2020 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 August 2020 400 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 July 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 July 2018 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 July 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 03 August 2017 34 days late Download