YORKSHIRE PLAY

Charity number: 1118846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2020 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 October 2017 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required