Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR INFLUENZA AND OTHER RESPIRATORY DISEASES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATE 6 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2017 as amended on 06 Sep 2018 as amended on 29 Aug 2019 as amended on 11 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING THE PREVENTION, DETECTION, TREATMENT AND CONTROL OF INFLUENZA AND OTHER RESPIRATORY VIRUS DISEASES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Maes buddion
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.