Financial history MANCHESTER PRIDE LIMITED

Charity number: 1117848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.60m £2.17m £2.35m £3.94m £720.86k
Total expenditure £1.54m £2.22m £2.25m £3.92m £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £12.00k £42.00k £42.00k £151.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £94.81k £109.25k £98.02k £114.32k £9.57k
Income - Other trading activities £1.48m £2.03m £2.18m £3.78m £559.38k
Income - Charitable activities £29.00k £36.30k £75.53k £36.73k £151.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £2.22m £2.25m £3.92m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £304.66k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.44k £5.44k £6.30k £7.70k £7.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £32.49k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0