Trustees MANCHESTER PRIDE LIMITED

Charity number: 1117848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Wheeler Chair 05 December 2016
None on record
Temiloluwa Nicola Adeyemi Adebayo Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Tim Westwood Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Sharon Pegg Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Victoria Empson Trustee 25 April 2020
None on record
Stephen Bowen Trustee 25 March 2020
FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS
Received: On time
Michael Christopher Lawlor Trustee 25 March 2020
None on record
Max Emmerson Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
rajesh Joshi Trustee 31 October 2016
None on record
Robert James Hammond Malcomson Trustee 06 August 2013
None on record