Financial history WORCESTERSHIRE PARENT AND CARERS COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1122583
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £33.92k £44.02k £45.56k £60.77k £31.36k
Total expenditure £34.05k £34.92k £42.89k £45.91k £41.48k
Income from government contracts £5.61k £5.02k N/A £6.76k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.45k N/A £3.90k