ALLIANCE FOR INCLUSIVE EDUCATION

Charity number: 1124424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £158.22k £155.79k £139.48k £180.24k £260.10k
Total expenditure £198.57k £155.56k £135.96k £171.16k £155.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A