VINCENT'S APPEAL TRUST COMPANY

Charity number: 1117802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 June 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 June 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 10 May 2017 On time Download